Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barkley, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Healey, Jackson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Turner, Valderrama, and Waldstreicher
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Beginning in fiscal year 2017, increasing the amount of money from $20,000,000 to $40,000,000 the Governor is required to provide in the State budget for the Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414066/1
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-24)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 55A
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55A
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {414066/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (114-24) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM