Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Anderson, Branch, Conaway, Glenn, Luedtke, Moon, Oaks, Proctor, Sanchez, Sydnor, and West
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to specified provisions, requiring specified parole decisions to be transmitted to the Governor under specified circumstances, authorizing the Governor to disapprove specified parole decisions in a specified manner, providing that if the Governor does not disapprove a specified parole decision in a specified manner within a specified time period, the decision becomes effective; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0694
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0882 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {683424/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Vogt) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (79-55)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {683424/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (48-86) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Vogt) Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (79-55) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-305, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM