Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – Administration
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Hettleman, Hill, Lam, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in entering or renewing a contract for the administration of the Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers assessment or a successor assessment, to require that each segment of the assessment be administered within a 40-minute time period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Assessment – Administration
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM