Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Copies of Medical Records - Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, West, Reznik, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, and Krebs
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to authorize health care providers to require specified persons to pay a cost-based fee for providing specified information; altering the fees health care providers and hospitals may charge for copying and mailing specified medical records and for retrieving and preparing specified medical records; authorizing specified hospitals and other health care providers to charge specified fees for electronic copies of specified medical records; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896284/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437272/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {896284/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Finance 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {437272/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 724
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM