Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Basic Health Program - Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Angel, Hill, Kelly, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain Basic Health Program coverage in the State; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to the Department of Legislative Services and the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2019, on whether the State can implement, beginning January 1, 2020, a Basic Health Program that accomplishes certain objectives and take other certain action related to the implementation of the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0690
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 and 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Basic Health Program - Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Basic Health Program - Implementation
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM