Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Hucker, Barkley, Barnes, Braveboy, Burns, Carr, DeBoy, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Guzzone, Haynes, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, Kramer, Love, Luedtke, McHale, Minnick, Mitchell, Murphy, Niemann, Reznik, B. Robinson, Stukes, Swain, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, A. Washington, M. Washington, Weir, Zucker, and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the percentage of State money that must be used in an elementary or a secondary school construction project before the Prevailing Wage Law applies by altering specified definitions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883893/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/2 Rejected (40-89)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/1 Rejected (40-89)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {303928/3 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/1 Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/2 Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {883893/1 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/2 Rejected (40-89) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {763621/1 Rejected (40-89) 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {303928/3 Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/1 Rejected (16-31) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {343823/2 Rejected (16-30) 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM