Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law to provide that a general license to practice dental hygiene authorizes the licensee to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in specified facilities with dentally underserved populations, rather than only in a long-term care facility; altering the requirements that a dental hygienist is required to meet before being authorized to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in specified facilities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0644
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM