Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Afzali, Aumann, Boteler, Dwyer, Elliott, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, Ready, B. Robinson, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting public inspection of a petition after the petition is filed with the State Board of Elections or a county board of elections, with a specified exception; requiring a custodian to permit a person to inspect a petition if the person requires access to the petition to facilitate judicial review of a determination concerning the sufficiency of the petition; providing that a custodian may not disclose personal information contained in a petition to the general public; defining a term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0367
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0027 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2013 2/05/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM