Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Barron, Frush, Gaines, Haynes, Jalisi, Kelly, McComas, B. Robinson, Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue a public cease and desist order or impose a civil fine of no more than $5,000 per offense for specified violations of specified provisions of law under specified circumstances; and providing that each violation of specified provisions of law is a separate offense under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896081/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {896081/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator King) Adopted 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (39-6) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501, 7-502, 7-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM