Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Ciliberti, Cluster, Fisher, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Long, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, O'Donnell, Parrott, Shoemaker, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a church, a religious organization, or any other nonprofit organization exempt from taxation under § 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code from claiming an exemption from taxation or a tax credit under specified provisions of law; requiring the Comptroller and the State Department of Assessments and Taxation, under specified circumstances, to consult with the U.S. Department of Homeland Security; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM