Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a rental vehicle company or its designee has a specified right of subrogation against specified persons for specified claims paid by the rental vehicle company or the designee that arose out of the use or operation of the rental vehicle; requiring a rental vehicle company that receives a third party claim to provide a specified notice; authorizing an insurer to assume the handling of a specified claim; requiring a rental vehicle company to handle a claim until a specified insurer assumes the handling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0662
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM