Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Purple Line Light Rail Project - Excess Property - Donation
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Ivey, and Williams
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, the Maryland Transit Administration, and Purple Line Transit Partners, LLC, to donate any property acquired but not used for the construction or operation of the Purple Line light rail project to the governing body of the county in which that property is located.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Purple Line Light Rail Project - Excess Property - Donation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Purple Line Light Rail Project - Excess Property - Donation
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page