Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Adams, Afzali, Ali, Anderson, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Chang, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fisher, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jalisi, Jameson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Knotts, Krimm, J. Lewis, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Robinson, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Simonaire, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vogt, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, Wilkins, Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take certain steps to provide for the adoption of a certain dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing certain research facilities to enter into certain agreements with animal rescue organizations for certain purposes; requiring certain research facilities to submit certain information to the Secretary of Agriculture beginning December 1, 2019, and each year thereafter; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0675
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0528 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM