Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified cross-references to the Local Government Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland; correcting specified errors and omissions in and relating to the Local Government Article; clarifying the application of specified provisions; making specified conforming changes; deleting specified obsolete references; providing for the construction and effect of specified provisions of the Local Government Article; and making stylistic changes.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {120713/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2013 2/05/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {120713/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 35
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-401, 4-401, 5-114, 5-301, 6-410, 7-409, 7-501 )
(   13-104, 15-414 )
(   10-110, 13-302 )
(   10-111, 10-340, 10-508, 12-112, 12-115, 12-205, 12-304, 12-308 )
(   3-203, 4-306.2, 5-602 )
(   13-604, 2-204, 6-102, 7-101, 7-102, 9-104 )
(   15-504, 9-1608, 9-1614, 9-206, 9-505, 9-506, 9-697 )
(   7-116, 7-223 )
(   4-1608, 4-1609, 4-231, 4-239, 4-247 )
(   1-101, 11-206, 1-204, 1-206, 1-207, 1-301, 1-302, 1-402, 1-501, 17-208, 18-211, 22-403, 23-102, 5-104, 9-1607, 9-1608 )
(   3-107, 3-122, 3-908, 3-915, 5-307, 8-1103 )
(   12-1004 )
(   22-204, 29-101, 29-102 )
(   10-704, 10-706, 10-707, 11B-104 )
(   5-606, 6-222, 8-117, 8-202 )
(   15-802, 15-853, 2-1220, 2-1237 )
(   11-102, 4-103 )
(   7-243, 9-102 )
(   5-419, 8-610, 8-630 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM