Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Manufacturer's Licenses - Sampling, Sale, and Consumption of Products
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of multiple alcoholic beverage manufacturer's licenses to allow the sampling, sale, and consumption of products produced under the licenses at each of the licensed premises, subject to a specified restriction; repealing specified provisions of law that prohibit holders of specified manufacturer's licenses from selling or allowing to be consumed specified products; authorizing the holder of a farm brewery license to apply for and obtain, under a different name, additional licenses for specified premises; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-202, 2-204, 2-206, 2-210, 2-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM