Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, in consultation with the University of Maryland School of Pharmacy, to specify the prescription drugs that may be considered specialty drugs by a pharmacy benefits manager; requiring the Board to publish in the Maryland Register a list of the prescription drugs that may be considered specialty drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to designate on a formulary only prescription drugs that are on the list of specialty drugs published by the Board; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0928
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM