Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Carey, Charkoudian, Corderman, Haynes, Hettleman, C. Jackson, R. Lewis, McComas, Metzgar, Proctor, Qi, Valderrama, P. Young, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Cardin, Cox, Grammer, Griffith, J. Lewis, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each law enforcement agency to provide access to an employee assistance program or mental health program to address the mental health issues of police officers stemming from personal and work-related concerns and to provide police officers access to confidential mental health services; requiring each law enforcement agency to develop a policy to provide access to the required services at minimal cost to the police officer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0565
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {822716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {822716/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM