Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future
Sponsored by
Delegates Branch, Arora, Braveboy, Cardin, Conway, Cullison, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guzzone, Hixson, Hogan, Howard, Hucker, Ivey, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Luedtke, Morhaim, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Serafini, Simmons, Summers, Walker, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Maryland's Future; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the chair of the Commission to call the first meeting of the Commission on or before June 30, 2014; authorizing the chair to call specified additional meetings; requiring the Commission to hold specified public hearings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM