Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law to provide that a general license to practice dental hygiene authorizes the licensee to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in certain facilities, rather than only in a long-term care facility; altering the requirements, to include at least 3,000 hours of active clinical practice in direct patient care, that a dental hygienist is required to meet before being authorized to practice dental hygiene under the general supervision of a licensed dentist in certain facilities; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {236283/2 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {236283/2 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text - Chapter - Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM