Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of ounces of beer, from a maximum of 1 fluid ounce to a maximum of 4 fluid ounces, that a nonprofit beer festival permit holder may provide to a consumer under specified circumstances; requiring a person to submit an application for a specified nonprofit beer festival permit to the Comptroller instead of a local licensing board; and requiring a person to provide the Comptroller instead of a local licensing board with a list of specified brewing company off-site permit holders that will attend a specified festival.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM