Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Anderson, Korman, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to adopt a specified set of standards for the training and deployment of SWAT teams and of law enforcement officers not on a SWAT team who conduct no-knock warrant service in the State; and defining "SWAT team" as an agency-designated unit of law enforcement officers who are selected, trained, and equipped to work as a coordinated team to resolve specified critical incidents that may exceed the capabilities of first responders or investigative units.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0941
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0589 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {592516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-26)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Reporting and Limitations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {592516/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (113-26) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM