Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Carr, Kipke, Morgan, Oaks, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization from imposing a step therapy or fail-first protocol on an insured or an enrollee for a specified prescription drug used in the treatment of a specified cancer under specified circumstances; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2017.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0919
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {856783/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 678
Text - Chapter - President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-142 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM