Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who owns, operates, or controls a ticket website from using in the Uniform Resource Locator (URL) of the ticket website certain lower-level domain names that contain the name of the venue for which the tickets grant admission, the name of certain entertainment events, or certain other names; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773090/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {773090/1 Adopted 33
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 35
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Finance 36
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001, 14-4003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM