Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Atterbeary, Acevero, Anderson, Bagnall, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Boyce, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Guyton, Harrison, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Jackson, Johnson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Rogers, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, R. Watson, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a firearm manufactured using a computer-aided fabrication device unless the firearm is imprinted with a serial number issued by a federally licensed firearms manufacturer or importer; establishing penalties of up to 5 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $5,000, or both for violations of the Act; requiring, by September 30, 2019, the Department of State Police to develop a plan for a State system for the registration of certain firearms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0882
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {582918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-45)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms and Ghost Guns)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {582918/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 47
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-45) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-601 through 4-603, 7-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM