Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Barron, Carr, Carter, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Gutierrez, Kelly, Lam, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Tarlau, A. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a provider of water or sewerage system service to temporarily shut off service temporarily for reasons of health or safety or in a state or national emergency; requiring a provider to mail a specified notice when temporarily shutting off service; prohibiting a provider from shutting off service unless the provider posts specified notices at the premises within specified time periods; prohibiting a provider from shutting off service for specified reasons; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2A-01 through 9-2A-04, 9-658, 9-662, 9-663, 9-724, 9-939, 9-951 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM