Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation in a certain manner to an individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and subsequently confined for a felony on receipt of a certain order; authorizing an administrative law judge to issue an order that a certain individual is eligible for certain compensation and benefits from the State; authorizing an individual who has previously received compensation to request supplemental compensation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {512214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {512214/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page