Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to contract for certain renewable energy credits and electricity generated from certain Tier 1 renewable sources to meet a portion of the renewable energy portfolio standard for the electric company; requiring an electric company to solicit certain bids and award certain contracts in a certain manner; providing for certain remuneration for certain contracts; providing a required minimum of 10 years and maximum term of 20 years for certain contracts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page