Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Conaway, Hayes, and McCray
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request an operator of a Web site to remove the individual's photograph or digital image from the operator's Web site under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to make a specified request for removal of a photograph or digital image in a specified manner; requiring an operator of a Web site to remove the photograph or digital image of an individual within 30 days and to send a specified written confirmation within 5 business days, under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883998/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {883998/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM