Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the No Wrong Door Pilot Program in the Department of Human Resources; specifying that the purpose of the Program is to ensure that low-income residents of the State have access to the services needed to sustain themselves and their families; requiring the Department to consult with stakeholders to develop criteria for the evaluation of grant applications, and track and assess Program outcomes; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget for specified fiscal years an appropriation of at least $500,000; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0066 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   6-801 through 6-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page