Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Fennell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Recodifying and redefining credit repair businesses; delineating regulation for credit repair businesses by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; prohibiting a credit repair business from charging or receiving money or other valuable consideration prior to full and complete performance of certain services; limiting the acceptable terms in subscription agreements; requiring that credit repair businesses be licensed in a certain manner and be subject to certain provisions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0873
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1513 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1901, 14-19A-01 through 14-19A-17 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM