Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Job Training Grant Program in the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to provide 3-year grants to nonprofit organizations that provide job training; requiring a nonprofit organization to meet specified requirements in order to be eligible for a grant under the Program; requiring the Division to take specified actions regarding the Program; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018, and for each fiscal year thereafter, to include $500,000 in the budget bill to fund the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM