Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 - Baltimore City - Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Conaway, and Hayes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2013 and 2014 to change the grantees of the grants for the Skatepark of Baltimore at Roosevelt Park to the Mayor and City Council of the City of Baltimore; extending the deadline to June 1, 2016, for the grantee to present evidence of a specified matching fund; making this Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2013, 2014 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM