Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment, by October 1, 2020, to adopt regulations to establish procedures for conducting environmental investigations to determine lead hazards for children under the age of 6 years and pregnant women with elevated blood lead levels greater than or equal to 10 micrograms per deciliter; altering the conditions under which an owner of an affected property is required to comply with certain risk reduction standards; requiring the Department to report annually on the investigations required under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1722 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk Reduction
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-305, 6-819 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM