Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, D. Barnes, Branch, Ebersole, Fennell, Gaines, C. Howard, Kaiser, McIntosh, Patterson, Platt, Tarlau, Turner, Vaughn, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending, from June 30, 2016, to June 30, 2019, the termination provisions for the credit allowed against the State income tax for specified film production activities; limiting the annual amount of film production activity tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Business and Economic Development may issue to $25,000,000 for fiscal years 2017, 2018, and 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-730 )
(   2011, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM