Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to increase or add Executive Department items in the budget bill, subject to a specified limitation; providing for the veto by the Governor of only those items relating to the Executive Department that have been increased or added by the General Assembly; providing for the reversion to original appropriations of specified vetoed items in the budget bill; authorizing the General Assembly to override budget bill item vetoes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0808
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM