Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public school from prohibiting a student from engaging in a student-organized peaceful demonstration or imposing certain limits on a student's right to free speech, subject to certain limitations; prohibiting a public school from disciplining a student for engaging in a student-organized peaceful demonstration under certain circumstances; authorizing a public school to impose certain limitations on a student-organized peaceful demonstration under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {505961/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-312 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page