Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Gabapentin - Monitoring by Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to monitor the prescribing and dispensing of Gabapentin by all prescribers and dispensers in the State; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to submit a report on whether Gabapentin should be added to the a controlled dangerous substances schedule to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 31, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Gabapentin - Monitoring by Prescription Drug Monitoring Program and Report
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM