Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Birds - Oriole and Raven
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Anderson, Branch, Bromwell, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, Minnick, Mitchell, Olszewski, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Rudolph, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making the raven the second State bird of Maryland.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0860
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0752 Session: 2007 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/06/2013 Text - First - State Birds - Oriole and Raven
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM