Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Classroom Expenses for Teachers
Sponsored by
Delegates Schuh, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Cluster, Elliott, Frank, George, Hogan, Hough, Kach, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, Myers, Ready, Schulz, Serafini, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who is a teacher a credit against the State income tax for classroom expenses and supplies; providing that the credit may not exceed the State income tax for the taxable year and that any unused credit may not be carried over to any other taxable year; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0741
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0513 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM