Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a motorcycle dealer and a salesman employed by the dealer from restrictions on the number of annual vehicle shows in which the dealer or salesman may participate; creating an exception for motorcycle shows to the general requirement that vehicle shows offer only new vehicles; modifying a specified requirement that an application to the Motor Vehicle Administration to participate in a vehicle show include the names and addresses of all participating dealers; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Annual Vehicle Shows
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM