Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Common Core Disclosure Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McDonough and Kach
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to submit a report detailing all expenditures made due to the implementation of the Common Core State Standards in Baltimore County to the Baltimore County Executive, the Baltimore County Council, and the members of the Baltimore County Delegation to the General Assembly, annually, on or before December 1; and requiring the Board to make each report available to the public on the Board's Web site.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM