Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Murphy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an application for assisted outpatient treatment may be submitted to a court by specified individuals; requiring, except under specified circumstances, a court to hold a hearing on a specified application within a specified time period; authorizing, under specified circumstances, a court to order assisted outpatient treatment for a specified individual; requiring a specified order to include a specified treatment plan; requiring, under specified circumstances, a court to deny a specified application; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-929 through 10-937 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM