Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsored by
Delegates Otto, Anderton, Beidle, Cassilly, Clark, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Jacobs, Jalisi, Robinson, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a seasonal exceptional poultry hauling permit that authorizes specified axle configurations and specified increased weight limits while carrying live poultry from a farm to a processing facility from November 1 until April 30 annually in specified counties; requiring a combination of vehicles carrying live poultry with a trailer or semitrailer to submit to and pass a specified inspection twice yearly; requiring the operator of the specified vehicle to carry the inspection report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0917
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0698 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {430414/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628672/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {430414/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {628672/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-113.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM