Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that specified provisions of law granting a person who is issued special registration plates for individuals with disabilities the authority to park for unlimited periods of time in specified restricted parking zones do not supersede local ordinances in Baltimore City that restrict parking for vehicles that do not display specified residential parking permits.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0742
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-616 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM