Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Regional Transportation Authority Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Bridges, Lierman, Anderson, Boyce, Conaway, Corderman, Feldmark, Fennell, Glenn, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the General Assembly to contract with a qualified transportation entity to conduct a study on regional transportation authorities; providing for the scope of the study; requiring the entity conducting the study to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on or before October 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Regional Transportation Authority Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Regional Transportation Authority Study
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM