Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Delegates DeBoy, Aumann, Boteler, Bromwell, Burns, Cardin, Cluster, Frank, Kach, Lafferty, Malone, Minnick, Stein, Szeliga, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Baltimore County to the provisions of law relating to the Allegany County, Cecil County, Garrett County, Harford County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1475 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM