Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the inaugural festivities of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor be financed with private donations only if the private donations are received by an inaugural committee and disclosed by the inaugural committee; requiring an inaugural committee to file a statement of organization with the State Board of Elections before it may receive donations or make expenditures; requiring the treasurer of an inaugural committee to maintain detailed and accurate records of donations received and disbursements made; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {345168/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-33)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {345168/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (105-33) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM