Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Institution for Women - Reforms
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating the intention of the General Assembly that the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services implement certain reforms at the Maryland Correctional Institution for Women to the extent that funds are available in the State budget; including in the reforms to be instituted, by February 1, 2020, female inmates designated in prerelease status are to be offered comprehensive prerelease services that are the same as and of equal quality to the comprehensive prerelease services provided and offered to male inmates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {792514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Institution for Women - Reforms
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {792514/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Maryland Correctional Institution for Women - Reforms
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM