Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bromwell, Angel, Frick, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to collect certain information related to health care for all construction-related, competitive sealed bids for projects for a certain time period; requiring the Board to direct certain agencies to include certain information in a certain request; requiring the Board, by November 1, 2018, to report certain information to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0492
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {466083/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Procurement - Responsible Workforce Development Percentage Price Preference Act
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {466083/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Referred Rules 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM