Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Flanagan, Kittleman, W. Miller, Parrott, Szeliga, Jalisi, Valentino-Smith, Aumann, Beitzel, Cluster, Mautz, Metzgar, West, Arentz, Buckel, Carozza, Kipke, McKay, Rose, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from smoking marijuana in a public place, in or on a public conveyance, or in any specified area otherwise accessible to the public; establishing a penalty of a fine not to exceed $500 for violation of the Act; providing that a conviction under the Act is a shieldable conviction for a specified purpose; providing for the expungement of a conviction under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {142817/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {963229/7 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Clippinger) {253522/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Atterbeary) {253125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) {353629/1 Rejected (29-99)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Angel) {703929/1 Rejected
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {142817/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 44
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {963229/7 Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Clippinger) {253522/1 Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Atterbeary) {253125/1 Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) {353629/1 Rejected (29-99) 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Angel) {703929/1 Rejected 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-301 )
(   5-601, 5-601.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM